judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LANOUE (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 46031
Short Caption:LANOUE (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44641
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C200321Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/07/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/29/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-19398
10/25/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 05-21183
12/07/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 05-23986
12/07/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/03/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Supplemental record due: 35 days. 06-00067
01/13/2006Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order for Transcript filed in district court on 1/9/06. 06-00991
02/06/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 26, 2005. Court Reporter: Gina Shrader. 06-02599
03/02/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 26, 2005. Court Reporter: Gina Shrader. 06-04740
03/24/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. Accordingly, we "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-06248
04/18/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-07136
04/18/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 21, 2006. 06-07136