judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-7747
B-7747
07/11/1978
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT A. TURNER
GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION, KLIESING MOTOR COMPANY, GENERAL MOTORS AND KLIESING MOTOR COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/28/1979Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/26/1979Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/31/1979Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/16/1979Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/07/1979Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/30/1979Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
04/25/1979Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/25/1979Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/18/1979Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/05/1979Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/04/1979Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/28/1978Response to Brief filedPetitioner
12/11/1978Post submission brief filedRespondent
11/16/1978Reply to ResponseRespondent
08/31/1978Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/25/1978Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/24/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
07/24/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
07/11/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/28/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/26/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/13/1979Concurring Opinion issued.
06/13/1979Opinion issued
05/31/1979Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/16/1979Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/07/1979Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/30/1979Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
04/25/1979Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/25/1979Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/18/1979Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/16/1979Response to Motion filed
04/05/1979Motion for Rehearing
04/04/1979Motion for Rehearing
03/21/1979Letter Filed
01/22/1979Letter Filed
01/15/1979Letter Filed
12/28/1978Response to Brief filed
12/11/1978Post submission brief filed
11/16/1978Reply to Response
10/17/1978Motion for extension of time to argue. See remarksFiling granted
10/13/1978Motion for extension of time to argue. See remarks
10/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
10/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
08/31/1978Reply to Response
08/25/1978Response to Petition
07/24/1978Response to Petition
07/24/1978Response to Petition
07/11/1978Conditional application for writ of error filedFiling granted
07/11/1978Conditional application for writ of error filedFiling granted
07/11/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
LAW OFFICES OF PAT MALONEY, P.C.Amicus Curiae
General Motors and Kliesing Motor CompanyRespondent
Kronzer, Abraham and WatkinsAmicus Curiae
J. Hadley EdgarAmicus Curiae
General Motors CorporationRespondent
Kliesing Motor CompanyRespondent
Wayne Fisher and Fisher, Roch, and GallagherAmicus Curiae
Edwards and PerryAmicus Curiae
Robert A. TurnerPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information