judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SEELHOFF-PACKER VS. PACKER

Case Information: 46030
Short Caption:SEELHOFF-PACKER VS. PACKERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV0301556Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/11/2005 / Meador, ShawnSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Office of Richard F. Cornell--check no. 11213.
09/29/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-19400
10/11/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Shawn B. Meador. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/21/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement.
10/31/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-21469
11/02/2005Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. Response to Docketing Statement and Request for Sanctions. 05-21642
11/07/2005MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Response to Respondent's Notice of Objection to Appellant's Docketing Statement and Cross-Request for Appropriate Sanctions. 05-21903
01/20/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Request for Sanctions. The docketing statement inaccuracy is not of the magnitude to warrant imposing sanctions. We deny respondent's request for sanctions. 06-01537
02/10/2006MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. 06-03043
02/13/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 06-03183
02/16/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 06-03433
02/16/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.