judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ESTATE OF HOGAN VS. SUMMERLIN HOSPITAL MED. CTR.

Case Information: 47931
Short Caption:ESTATE OF HOGAN VS. SUMMERLIN HOSPITAL MED. CTR.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A462420Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/06/2006 / Roitman, HowardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Gordon & Rees, LLP--check no. 208457.
08/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17854
09/06/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Howard Roitman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/11/2006MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Motion to Stay Assignment to the Settlement Conference Program pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 06-18740
09/14/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Suggestion of Death Upon the Record. 06-18968
09/15/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 06-19102
09/25/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 06-19584
09/25/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. of Appellant's Confession of Error. 06-19625
09/29/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-19969
09/29/2006MotionFiled Response to Motion. Defendant James M. Hogan, M.D.'s Opposition to Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC's Notice of Appellant's Confession of Error, and Opposition to Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Motion to Stay Assignment to the Settlement Conference Program Pending Resolution. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 06-19986
10/06/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. on settlement judge. 06-20522
10/11/2006MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Assignment of Settlement Conference Program pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 06-20796
10/16/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Suggestion of Death upon the Record. (James M. Hogan, M.D.) 06-21254
12/14/2006MotionFiled Motion. for Substitution of Parties. 06-25577
02/06/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 07-02939
02/12/2007MotionFiled Motion. James M. Hogan, M.D.'s Dismissal of his Appeal Regarding the Order Granting Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC's Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement. 07-03439
03/02/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. The clerk shall modify the caption. The Estate of James M. Hogan, M.D., substituted in the place of appellant. Appellant has filed a motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal as the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal pursuant to the settlement conference program. We grant the motion and " . . . dismiss this appeal." NRAP 42(b). fn1[We deny as moot respondent's motions to dismiss this appeal, to stay assignment to the settlement program, and to file a reply in support of both of those motions.] SNP07-MG/MD/MC 07-05054
03/02/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.