judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CRUMP (THOMAS) VS. WARDEN (DEATH PENALTY-PC)

Case Information: 46033
Short Caption:CRUMP (THOMAS) VS. WARDEN (DEATH PENALTY-PC)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 8901200HClassification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/27/2006How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/29/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-19402
10/21/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts.
10/31/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-21449
10/31/2005Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 05-21450
01/27/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (First Request) (Death Penalty) 06-02097
02/03/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: March 28, 2006. 06-02502
03/28/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (second request-30 days requested) 06-06524
03/30/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: April 27, 2006. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 06-06765
04/26/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-08851
04/26/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 11. 06-08864
05/26/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-11248
06/26/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-13186
07/10/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until August 25, 2006, to file and serve the reply brief. 06-14084
08/25/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-17738
09/25/2006BriefReceived Reply Brief. 06-19633
09/27/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on September 25, 2006. 06-19822
09/27/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. 06-19633
09/27/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/29/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP07M-MG/WM/MD 06-24443
12/18/2006Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 06-25787
12/26/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01/03/07 Order Recalling Remittitur.jcr 06-26001
12/26/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/03/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Recalling Remittitur. On November 29, 2006, this court entered an order affirming the judgment of the district court. Appellant filed a timely petition for rehearing on December 18, 2006. On December 26, 2006, this court inadvertently issued the remittitur. We hereby recall the remittitur previously issued in this appeal. 07-00122
01/03/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 28, 2006. 01/03/07 Order Recalling Remittitur.aa 06-26001
01/31/2007Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP07-WM/MG/MD 07-02554
02/09/2007MotionFiled Motion. Request to Stay Remittitur Pending Petition for Rehearing En Banc. 07-03362
02/09/2007Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. 07-03363
03/01/2007Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn2[We deny appellant's motion to stay the issuance of the remittitur pending the resolution of this petition as moot.] EN BANC 07-04943
03/01/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-04964
03/01/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/05/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 2, 2007. 07-04964