judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: ESTATE OF KOZSAN

Case Information: 46034
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF KOZSANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P49394Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/07/2005 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from R. Paul Sorenson--check no. 27409.
09/29/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-19406
10/07/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge:William F. Buchanan . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/20/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-20821
10/31/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 05-21382
10/31/2005Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 05-21383
10/31/2005Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 05-21384
11/14/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 05-22286
11/14/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.