judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IRISH VS. GORMLEY

Case Information: 46004
Short Caption:IRISH VS. GORMLEYCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36549 , 41103 , 62511 , 74248 , 74368 , 74369 , 74370 , 76458 , 76458-COA , 76533 , 76533-COA , 76556 , 76556-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D226880Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/04/2005 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/20/2007How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Bruce I. Shapiro, Ltd.--check no. 4235.
09/27/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-19128
10/04/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/20/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement.
10/20/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 05-20816
11/07/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 05-21913
11/16/2005Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. This appeal should be removed from the program. 05-22567
12/29/2005Settlement Order/Procedural Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. Pursuant to the recommendation of the settlement judge and good cause appearing, this appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request due: 10 days. Opening brief and appendix due: 70 days. 05-25381
01/17/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/29/03 and 06/15/05. To Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. 06-01132
01/25/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 01/29/03 and 06/15/05. Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. 06-01861
03/16/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Child Custody Brief and Appendix.
03/29/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Stipulation attached to Motion. 06-06595
04/11/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We conclude that the briefing schedule in this appeal is governed by NRAP 31(a)(1), rather than NRAP 31(a)(2). Appellant shall have until May 26, 2006, to file the opening brief and appendix, and respondent shall have until July 25, 2006, to file the answering brief. 06-07580
05/01/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Supplemental Request. Transcripts requested: 04/13/05 and 06/06/05. To Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. 06-09112
05/10/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 4/13/05 and 6/6/05 (SEALED). Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. 06-09804
05/25/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule. 06-11131
05/31/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: June 26, 2006. Answering brief due: August 28, 2006. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 06-11396
06/30/2006MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Permission to file Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages and for Extension of Time to Serve and File Brief. 06-13575
08/09/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to file Opening Brief and Appendix. We direct the clerk to file the opening brief and appendix received on June 30, 2006. 06-16468
08/09/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-13576
08/09/2006AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volumes 1 through 12. 06-13577
08/29/2006MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion for (1) Permission to File Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages and (2) to Strike Inappropriate Material Contained in the Joint Appendix Prepared by Appellant and for Sanctions Pursuant to NRAP 30(g)(1). 06-17912
08/29/2006BriefReceived Answering Brief. 06-17914
08/29/2006AppendixReceived Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 06-17915
09/05/2006MotionFiled Response to Motion. Limited Opposition to Respondent's Motion for (1) Permission to File Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages and (2) to Strike Inappropriate Material Contained in the [Joint] Appendix Prepared by Appellant and for Sanctions Pursuant to NRAP 30(G)(1). 06-18288
09/26/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Filing Answering Brief and Appendix and Denying Motion to Strike Portions of Joint Appendix and for Sanctions. We grant the motion in part as to the length of the answering brief and deny the motion in part as to the content of the joint appendix and sanctions. The clerk shall file the 52-page answering brief and appendix received on August 29, 2006. Reply brief due: 30 days. 06-19750
09/26/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-17914
09/26/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Volumes 1 and 2. 06-17915
10/02/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-20148
10/05/2006Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. On September 26, 2006, this court entered an order that directed the clerk to file the answering brief. That order further directed appellant to file a reply brief by October 26, 2006. Appellant's motion for an extension of time until October 9, 2006, to file the reply brief is denied as moot. 06-20419
10/30/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. 06-22072
02/27/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Black Lobello & Sparks. 07-04681
07/20/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 07-15908
07/20/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP07-RP/JH/NS
10/02/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "We reverse all three of the district court's dispositional orders discussed herein and remand for further proceedings." NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-21753
10/30/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-22192
10/30/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/09/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 1, 2007. 07-22192
06/20/2016MotionFiled Motion for to Seal Court Record. 16-19777
06/29/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed, in pro se, an unopposed motion to seal the record in this case. Appellant represents that the district court case is sealed and this case should also be sealed. However, appellant does not specifically identify any documents that have been filed in this court that were filed under seal in the district court, or that should be sealed in this court, and cites no authority in support of her request to seal the entire record. Accordingly, the motion is denied. 16-20360