judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-7758
B-7758
07/14/1978
Application for Writ of Error
REPUBLIC NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
VELMA L. HEYWARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/24/1978Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/26/1978Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/11/1978Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/11/1978Response to PetitionPetitioner
08/08/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/31/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
07/14/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/24/1978Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/26/1978Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/11/1978Reply to Response
08/11/1978Response to Petition
08/08/1978Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/31/1978Response to Petition
07/14/1978Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/14/1978Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Republic National Life Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Texas Trial Lawyers AssociationAmicus Curiae
Velma L. HeywardRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information