judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOME SELLERS SOLUTIONS VS. MOORE

Case Information: 46003
Short Caption:HOME SELLERS SOLUTIONS VS. MOORECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43527
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A458822Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/08/2006How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/26/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from William L. McGimsey--check no. 17375.
09/26/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-19111
09/30/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Documents. It has been determined that this appeal willl not be scheduled for settlement conference. Transcript request form due: 15 days. Opening Brief due: 120 days.
10/17/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-20501
10/20/2005Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 05-20813
01/30/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-02199
01/30/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1through 3. 06-02202
02/27/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-04475
04/07/2006Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
11/08/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 06-22829
11/08/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP07M-MG/WM/MD
11/17/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Affirmance and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for further proceedings with this order." SNP07M-MG/WM/MD 06-23668
12/12/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-24453
12/12/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/18/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 15, 2006. 06-24453