judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCAN HEALTH PLAN VS. DIST. CT. (SCHULTZ)

Case Information: 46037
Short Caption:SCAN HEALTH PLAN VS. DIST. CT. (SCHULTZ)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0500809Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/30/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Alverson Taylor Mortensen & Sanders--check no. 63010.
09/30/2005Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 05-19463
09/30/2005AppendixFiled Appendix. 05-19464
09/30/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit. Due Date: 10 days
10/10/2005Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Petitioner's Affidavit of Deborah Shulman as the Party Beneficially Interested to the Petition for Writ of Prohibition following Denial of Petitioners' Motion to Quash Service of Process. 05-19941
10/10/2005Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Petitioner's Affidavit of Russell Browe, M.D., as the Party Beneficially Interested to the Petition for Writ of Prohibition following Denial of Petitioners' Motion to Quash Service of Process. 05-19942
02/07/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. Petitioners shall have fifteen days from the date the answer is served to file any reply. 06-02737
03/06/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Christopher Brower in place and stead of Nathan R. Reinmiller as counsel for Russell Brower. 06-04849
03/06/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Christopher Brower in place and stead of Nathan R. Reinmiller as counsel for Scan Health Plan. 06-04850
03/09/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-05193
03/14/2006Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Answer due: April 10, 2006. 06-05426
03/30/2006Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer of Real Parties in Interest. 06-06688
03/30/2006AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix of Real Parties in Interest. 06-06689
04/12/2006Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. 06-07707
08/31/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on November 6, 2006, at 2:00 p.m. (En Banc)
09/08/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Kent Thomas Brandmeyer as counsel for Petitioners. The notice states that Brandmeyer has "previously been admitted to practice pro hoc vice pursuant to SCR 42." 06-18650
10/23/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
11/01/2006MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Vacate and Reschedule Hearing. 06-22348
11/02/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Vacating Argument and Setting for Submission. we approve the stipulation, and we vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for November 6, 2006, at 2:00 p.m. The parties shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, file either a stipulation to dismiss this matter or a status report informing this court of the progress of their mediation. 06-22471
11/16/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. David Jay Ozeran (previously admitted under SCR 42) appearing for petitioners. 06-23549
12/19/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file either a Stipulation to Dismiss this Writ Petition or a Status Report. We direct the parties to file a stipulation to dismiss this matter or a status report within 10 days of the date of this order. Failure to comply wit this court's order may result in the dismissal of this matter as abandoned. 06-25949
12/29/2006MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Petition. Filed via fax--original to follow. 06-26646
01/03/2007MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Petition. (original of fax filed on 12/29/06) 07-00126
01/09/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Petition. Pursuant to the stipualtion of the parties, and cause appearing, " . . . this writ petition is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). EN BANC/CLK 07-00572
01/09/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.