judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROCKY MTN. BLDRS. & SUPPLY VS. BAILEY & DUTTON

Case Information: 46016
Short Caption:ROCKY MTN. BLDRS. & SUPPLY VS. BAILEY & DUTTONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0500291Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/2005 / Evans, MargaretSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Douglas K. Fermoile--check no. 8808.
09/27/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-19164
09/30/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge:Margaret Springgate Evans . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/20/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement.
10/27/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-21270
10/27/2005Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 05-21271
12/15/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 12/29/05. 05-24447
12/30/2005MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation and Request to Suspend Briefing Schedule. Nos. 45879/46016 - cases are not consolidated. 05-25485
01/03/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 06-00109
01/20/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties note that a related case, No. 44193, is scheduled for oral argument on February 15, 2006. We grant the joint motions to suspend the briefing schedules in these appeals. The settlement judge's report (No. 46016) that the parties request that all of their case be consolidated in the hearing currently set. No good cause appearing, we deny such a request. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement in No. 46016and briefing shall remain suspended. Briefing in No. 45879 shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Nos. 45879/46016 - cases are not consolidated. 06-01524
08/30/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We conclude that this court should now consider whether briefing should be reinstated in these appeals. Within 10 days from the date of this order, appellant's counsel shall consult with respondent's counsel and notify this court in writing whether the parties believe that briefing should be reinstated in these appeals. Alternatively, within the same time period, the parties may file a stipulation to dismiss these appeals. Nos. 45879/46016 - not consolidated. 06-18063
09/06/2006MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 45879 and 46016 (not consolidated). 06-18417
09/13/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 06-18854
09/13/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.