judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MILLIGAN-TAHOE LLC VS. DOUGLAS COUNTY

Case Information: 46015
Short Caption:MILLIGAN-TAHOE LLC VS. DOUGLAS COUNTYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 03CV0020Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:10/04/2005 / Shipman, MadelynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:05/08/2007 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/08/2007How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Alling & Jillson, Ltd.--check no. 4648.
09/27/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-19165
10/04/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Madelyn Shipman . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/12/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. 05-20228
10/17/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 13, 15, and 16, 2005. To Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. 05-20426
10/17/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Notice of Appeal served on Court Reporter Joan Wilder. 05-20427
10/17/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on all parties and settlement judge. 05-20428
10/25/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Notice of Errata to Docketing Statement. 05-21106
10/31/2005MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion for Stay of Enforcement of Judgment (NRAP 8). 05-21391
10/31/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 13, 2005, June 15, 2005 and June 16, 2005. Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. 05-21453
11/01/2005Notice/Outgoing Letter. Madelyn Shipman (Motion for Stay of Enforcement of Judgment).
11/08/2005MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Stay of Enforcement of Judgment (NRAP 8). 05-21976
11/15/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Exhibits to the Motion for Stay of Enforcement of Judgment - Thomas J. Hall. 05-22418
11/15/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Exhibts to the Motion for Stay of Enforcement of Judgment - Thomas E. Perkins. 05-22422
12/22/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. for Stay. In determining whether to grant a stay pending appeal, this court considers four factors. Appellants have not demonstrated that these factors militate in favor of a stay. We deny appellants' motion. 05-24932
02/24/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. 06-04178
04/24/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 06-08586
04/26/2006Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the briefing schedule. Appellants: 45 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 06-08748
06/07/2006MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 30, 2006. 06-11919
06/30/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-13633
06/30/2006AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volumes 1 through 4. 06-13635
07/27/2006MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 24, 2006. 06-15556
08/18/2006MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: respondents (except Douglas County) answering brief not to exceed 40 pages. 06-17224
08/24/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondents Allen, Miller, Page, Pohl, Clancy, Rottman, Stellabotte, Tucker, Twining, Vallerga, Wilhoyte and Winne. 06-17568
08/24/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. Douglas County's Answering Brief. 06-17591
08/25/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to Respondent's Answering Brief. (Respondents Allen, Miller, Page, Pohl, Clancy, Rottman, Stellabotte, Tucker, Twining, Vallerga, Wilhoyte and Winne) 06-17736
09/25/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. 06-19632
03/20/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on May 8, 2007, at 11:30 a.m. (En Banc) 07-06349
04/23/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 07-08959
04/24/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. of Change of Responsible Attorney (NRAP 46). 07-09136
05/08/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. EN BANC.
11/21/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order." EN BANC-WM/MG/JH/RP/MD/MC/NS. Maupin, C.J., concurring. --Per 2/25/08 order, DELETED the sentence on lines 1 and 2 of page 3, and modified the sentence beginning on line 7 of page 4. Per 02/26/08 order, vacated and replaced text of footnote 10.-- 07-25382
12/07/2007Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 07-26530
12/07/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Alling & Jillson, Ltd. - check no. 6747.
12/07/2007MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Correct Clerical Errors. 07-26540
12/07/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Thomas J. Hall--check no. 21358. (Additional $50 due.)
12/07/2007Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. (Respondents) 07-26543
12/07/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. (Additional $50 due.) Due date: 10 days. 07-26544
12/12/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. Additional $50 from received from Thomas J. Hall, Esq. - check no. 21367.
01/03/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Answers to Petitions for Rehearing. Appellants and Respondents: 15 days to file an answer. 08-00269
01/16/2008Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellants Answer to Intervenors' Petition for Rehearing. 08-01280
01/18/2008Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent Douglas County. 08-01455
01/22/2008Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondents Allen, Miller, Page, Pohl, Clancy, Rottman, Stellabotte, Tucker, Twining, Vallerga, Wilhoyte and Winne. 08-01613
02/25/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Correcting Clerical Errors in Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part, and Remanding. We grant the motion to correct clerical errors. We direct the clerk to delete the sentence on lines 1 and 2 of page 3 of the November 21, 2007, order. We further direct the clerk to modify the sentence beginning on line 7 of page 4 of the order. 08-04515
02/26/2008Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. Order Denying Rehearing and Amending Prior Order. "We deny the petition." We have concluded that our order entered on November 21, 2007, includes a footnote regarding attorney fees that is too restrictive and that should be amended. We therefore vacate the text of footnote 10 and issue replacement text. (See order for replacement text). 08-04623
03/03/2008MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Verifed Memorandum of Costs. 08-05275
03/05/2008MotionFiled Response to Motion. (Respondents Allen, Miller, Page, Pohl, Clancy, Rottman, Stellabotte, Tucker, Twining, Vallerga, Wilhoyte and Winne's) Opposition and Objection to Appellants' Verfied Memorandum of Costs. 08-05548
03/14/2008MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Response in Support of Verfied Memorandum of Costs. 08-06493
03/19/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Corrected Certificate of Mailing - Appellant's Response in Support of Verfied Memorandum of Costs. 08-06780
03/21/2008MotionFiled Response to Motion. Reply in Support of Opposition and Objection to Appellants' Verified Memorandum of Costs. 08-06961
03/27/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants having failed to file a bill of costs in a timely manner, we disapprove appellants' memorandum of costs. 08-07557
03/27/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-07570
03/27/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/02/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 1, 2008. 08-07570