judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-7750
B-7750
07/12/1978
Application for Writ of Error
AMBER CONSTRUCTION, INC. AND TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY
LINDY DENNIS AIR CONDITIONING, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/15/1979Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/06/1978Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/27/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
07/21/1978Errata FiledPetitioner
07/12/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/16/1979Response to Motion filed
02/15/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/07/1978Response to Motion filed
12/06/1978Motion for Rehearing
07/27/1978Response to Petition
07/21/1978Errata Filed
07/12/1978Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/12/1978Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lindy Dennis Air Conditioning, Inc.Respondent
Amber Construction, Inc. and Travelers Indemnity CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information