judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BUENA VS. LAS VEGAS METRO. POLICE DEP'T

Case Information: 46005
Short Caption:BUENA VS. LAS VEGAS METRO. POLICE DEP'TCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A479509Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/17/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/27/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 05-19131
10/17/2005Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. Transcripts Requested: July 8, 2004 and August 16, 2005. Court Reporter: unknown. 05-20455
11/07/2005BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 05-21943
11/10/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. A479509: 120 days. 05-22218
02/17/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 06-03683
02/17/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/24/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. ". . . we affirm the district court's order." fn4-[We deny appellant's transcript request filed on October 17, 2005.] SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-06298
04/06/2006Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Motion for Rehearing the Order of Affirmance and Stipulation for Compromise and Order. 06-07318
05/01/2006Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[NRAP 40(c).] SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-09089
05/26/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-09542
05/26/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 30, 2006. 06-09542