judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BIRD (KEITH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47945
Short Caption:BIRD (KEITH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 75121 , 75121-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C205222Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/29/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/29/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17958
09/19/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Response. Response from the State due: 20 days. 06-19256
10/05/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. State's Response to Supreme Court Order. 06-20461
10/30/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP07M-MG/WM/MD 06-22143
11/28/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-23566
11/28/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/06/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 30, 2006. 06-23566