judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WITZENBURG (BRETT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 45997
Short Caption:WITZENBURG (BRETT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45462 , 51197
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C207911Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/23/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-19004
09/23/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 6/8/05, 6/27/05, 7/6/05, 7/11/05 and 8/15/05. Court Reporters: Sonia Riley and Stacy Briggs. Filed in district court on: September 20, 2005. 05-19005
10/11/2005TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: Wednesday, June 8, 2005; Monday, June 27, 2005; Wednesday, July 6, 2005; Monday, July 11, 2005. Court Reporter: Sonia L. Riley. 05-20038
11/10/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-22226
11/17/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix received on November 10, 2005. Fast track response due: 20 days. 05-22656
11/17/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-22230
11/17/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volumes 1 and 2. 05-22232
11/29/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-23426
02/17/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-03574
03/15/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-04338
03/15/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/24/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 17, 2006. 06-04338