judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EKINS VS. KELLY

Case Information: 47927
Short Caption:EKINS VS. KELLYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A503466Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/01/2006 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Beckley Singleton--check no. 215860.
08/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17848
09/01/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/12/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 06-18848
09/18/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Docketing Statement. 06-19158
09/18/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-19185
10/06/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 06-20533
10/06/2006Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 06-20534
10/19/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 06-21533
10/19/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.