judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VOLPICELLI VS. INMAN

Case Information: 45999
Short Caption:VOLPICELLI VS. INMANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0303582Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/28/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/26/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/26/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 05-19052
10/21/2005BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 05-20927
10/25/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. CV030582: 120 days. 05-21147
11/17/2005Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on October 25, 2005 (Order denies appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis.) 05-22714
02/28/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 06-04540
02/28/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/02/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-02702
02/28/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-04403
02/28/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/06/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 2, 2007. 07-04403