judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHAMMOT (DANIEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47943
Short Caption:SHAMMOT (DANIEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47809 , 52146 , 68161
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C211711Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/09/2007How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/29/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/29/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17930
09/08/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-18610
09/25/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts.
10/18/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/26/06 and 04/27/06. To Court Reporter: Department VII. 06-21372
01/19/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Appellant to file Opening Brief and Appendix and directing Court Reporter to file Transcript. Opening brief and appendix due: 20 days. fn3[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] Transcripts due; 10 days. If more time is needed, Ms. Silvaggio shall, within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time or if the transcripts cannot be produced, shall notify this court, in writing of this fact. 07-01480
01/26/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-02116
01/31/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension of time to file transcripts. Due: 2/8/07. 07-02455
02/12/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 06/26/06 and 06/27/06. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 07-03384
04/06/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-07743
04/18/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on March 26, 2007. Answering brief due: 30 days. 07-08719
04/18/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-06812
04/18/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 07-06814
04/20/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. 07-08934
04/20/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 07-08935
05/31/2007Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
07/09/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 07-14858
07/09/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/07/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP07-MG/MD/MC. 07-17326
09/04/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-17440
09/04/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/11/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 7, 2007. 07-17440