judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARTINEZ VS. GALLAGHER BASSET SERVICES

Case Information: 47942
Short Caption:MARTINEZ VS. GALLAGHER BASSET SERVICESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0502269Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/01/2006 / Eisenberg, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/29/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Diaz & Galt, LLC--check no. 5442.
08/29/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17895
08/31/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-18134
09/01/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert Eisenberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/20/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-19396
09/21/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/21/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 06-19437
09/21/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. (cross-appeal) Due Date: 10 days
09/21/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. (cross-appeal) Due Date: 10 days
09/21/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Submitted by respondent/cross-appellant. 06-19469
09/22/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. (Added U.S. Gypsum as a respondent/cross-appellant.) Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties.
09/25/2006Notice/Outgoing Letter. Robert Eisenberg. (Case Appeal Statement and Notice of Cross-Appeal)
09/26/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 on cross-appeal from Piscevich & Fenner--check no. 19993.
09/29/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 06-20088
10/04/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Respondent/Cross-Appellant Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 06-20376
11/06/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 06-22684
11/14/2006Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant/cross-respondent and respondents/cross-appellants: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). Appellant/cross-respondent: 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. See NRAP 31(a)(1). 06-23321
12/05/2006Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 06-24802
12/12/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Appellant/Cross-Respondent.
12/22/2006Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 06-26314
12/27/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Appellant may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. 06-26444
01/11/2007MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 07-00876
02/12/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 14, 2007. 07-03392
03/08/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Allowing Appeal to Proceed. Briefing shall proceed as provided in this court's November 14, 2006, order and the stipulation and order entered on February 12, 2007, extending the time for the opening brief. 07-05489
03/12/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-05773
03/22/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: April 13, 2007. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 07-06540
04/13/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-08355
04/13/2007AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 07-08356
05/11/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondents' Answering Brief/Cross-Appellant's Opening Brief. 07-10549
05/11/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Supplemental Joint Appendix. 07-10550
06/14/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 13, 2007. 07-13062
07/12/2007BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellants Reply/Answering Brief. 07-15198
08/09/2007BriefFiled Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. 07-17598
09/24/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the court's order." SNP08-RP/MD/NS 07-20958
09/27/2007MotionFiled Motion. Verified Bill of Costs. 07-21425
10/19/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We conclude that costs are not properly taxed against any party in this matter. Accordingly, the clerk shall not insert costs in favor of any party in the remittitur. 07-23110
10/19/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-22124
10/19/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/30/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 24, 2007. 07-22124