judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JONES (ROBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47939
Short Caption:JONES (ROBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33748 , 39039 , 41626 , 55832 , 58950 , 61453 , 61735 , 64606 , 73801 , 73801-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C149083Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice DouglasPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/08/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2006OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/28/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17875
09/14/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed 8/28/06. Due Date: 10 days
09/22/2006Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified Finding of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on 8/28/06 (submitted in response to the notice issued on 9/14/06). 06-19517
10/06/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-20500
11/08/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 5. 06-22941
11/08/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/29/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP07-WM/MG/MC 07-02237
02/23/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-03705
02/23/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/05/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 1, 2007. 07-03705