judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCHWIGER (LAWRENCE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47944
Short Caption:SCHWIGER (LAWRENCE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39007 , 47484 , 47869 , 48483 , 48579 , 49303 , 49907 , 51039 , 61911 , 63123 , 74330 , 74330-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C173970Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/29/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/29/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17939
09/26/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP07-NB/JH/RP 06-19673
10/24/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-20952
10/24/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/03/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 26, 2006. 06-20952