judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO HAMMOND

Case Information: 47940
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO HAMMONDCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - FV0503309Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/29/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/29/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17883
09/08/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-18605
09/08/2006Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 06-18606
09/08/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. 06-18607
09/13/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Attorney General: Certification of Constitutional Issue. 06-18856
09/14/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Attorney General: Certification of Constitutional Issue. (Corrected notice.) 06-19012
09/18/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondent may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellants' response is served. 06-19141
10/02/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 06-20147
01/19/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-01400
02/13/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-03001
02/13/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/21/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 15, 2007. 07-03001