judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

STATE OF TEXAS, BIG LAKE OIL COMPANY AND GROUP NO. 1 OIL CORPORATION, ET AL. v. HUMBLE OIL AND REFINING COMPANY, REAGAN COUNTY PURCHASING COMPANY, INC.

Case: A-330
A-330
09/04/1944
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS, BIG LAKE OIL COMPANY AND GROUP NO. 1 OIL CORPORATION, ET AL.
HUMBLE OIL AND REFINING COMPANY, REAGAN COUNTY PURCHASING COMPANY, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/04/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/04/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/16/1945Reply to ResponseRespondent
04/02/1945Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
04/02/1945Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
03/15/1945Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
03/15/1945Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
02/14/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/13/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/08/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/05/1945Reply to ResponseRespondent
12/18/1944Appendix FiledPetitioner
12/18/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
12/18/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
10/30/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
10/30/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
10/30/1944Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
09/04/1944Appendix FiledPetitioner
09/04/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
09/04/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/04/1945Motion for Rehearing
06/04/1945Motion for Rehearing
06/04/1945Motion for Leave to file Motion for Rehearing
05/31/1945Letter Filed
04/16/1945Reply to Response
04/16/1945Response to Motion filed
04/02/1945Supplemental Brief filed
04/02/1945Supplemental Brief filed
03/26/1945Letter Filed
03/22/1945Letter Filed
03/15/1945Brief in Support of Petition
03/15/1945Brief in Support of Petition
02/14/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/13/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/08/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/31/1945Order from Lower Court filed
01/05/1945Reply to Response
12/23/1944Letter Filed
12/18/1944Appendix Filed
12/18/1944Brief in Support of Petition
12/18/1944Brief in Support of Petition
10/30/1944Response to Petition
10/30/1944Response to Petition
10/30/1944Brief in Support of Petition
09/04/1944Appendix Filed
09/04/1944Conditional application for writ of error filedRefused
09/04/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
09/04/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
09/04/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Reagan County Purchasing Company, Inc.Respondent
Big Lake Oil Company and Group No. 1 Oil Corporation, et al.Petitioner
State of TexasPetitioner
Humble Oil and Refining CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information