judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VAULT (ROBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34805
Short Caption:VAULT (ROBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C158991Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/10/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08530
09/24/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney David C. Amesbury shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-09122
10/01/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from attorney David Amesbury enclosing a copy of the Guilty Plea Agreement filed in the district court on May 26, 1999. 99-09473
10/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 1, 1999, this court received a letter from Amesbury, asking that this court's order of September 24, 1999, be vacated. We conclude that Amesbury's argument that appellant has waived his right to appeal is without merit. Counsel's letter is therefore of no effect, and accordingly no action shall be taken thereon by this court. If he has not already done so, Amesbury shall immediately file a transcript request form or a certificate that no transcript is required and shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 30 days of this order. 99-09894
11/15/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time in Which to File the Appellate's Fast Track Statement Appendix 99-11217
11/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel for appellant shall, within 5 days of this order, provide this court with a file-stamped copy of the rough draft transcript request form that was filed in the district court. The motion for an extension of time is granted. The fast track statement and appendix shall be filed within 30 days of this order. 99-11893
12/15/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-12657
12/15/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-12659
01/04/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-00080
01/04/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-00081
06/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-09971
07/11/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-11899
07/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 11, 2000. 00-11899