judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DONALD JOSEPH EVERITTS v. CAREY HUNTER ININNS, f/k/a CAREY HUNTER EVERITTS

Case Heading (S-07-0153)
Case Number:S-07-0153Case Docketed On:07/12/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:DONALD JOSEPH EVERITTS v. CAREY HUNTER ININNS, f/k/a CAREY HUNTER EVERITTS
Full Title:DONALD JOSEPH EVERITTS, Appellant (Defendant), v. CAREY HUNTER ININNS, f/k/a CAREY HUNTER EVERITTS, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDonald Joseph EverittsMatthew F.G. Castano
AppelleeCarey Hunter IninnsLea Jacobs Kuvinka

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Custody/Visitation
Opinion Number:2008 WY 41
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/12/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/12/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/24/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on cdBriefAppellantFinal
10/05/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from appelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/09/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/23/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/29/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/09/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/25/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/28/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/02/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal