judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID P. ABLE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1012
Short Caption:DAVID P. ABLE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-10919-09Filed Date:08/16/2010

Opening Event Date:08/16/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/17/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/14/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/20/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/23/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid P. Able Y
Tonya L. FlemingNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/16/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Tonya Fleming, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
09/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Tonya Fleming, Esquire
10/04/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)(with attached Motion for Appeal Transcript filed in the Superior Court) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (39 pgs/Janifer) 5/21/09 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (6 pgs/tape) 7/7/09 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (121 pgs/Burr) 7/21/10 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (6 pgs/tape) 8/19/09 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (8 pgs/tape) 10/14/09 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (4 pgs/tape) 11/23/09 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (14 pgs/tape) 12/15/09 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (10 pgs/tape) 1/14/10 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (5 pgs/tape) 3/4/10 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (6 pgs/tape) 5/18/10 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (9 pgs/tape) 5/28/09 proc.
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (15 pgs/tape) 7/23/10 proc. w/cd
12/17/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/29/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/29/2010RECORD INDEX
12/29/2010RECORD COPIES
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (SEALED pleadings)
02/07/2011APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD with attached Grand Jury transcript
02/07/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/07/2011APPENDIX - attached to Appellant's Brief
02/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (4 pgs/tape) 7/7/10 proc.
02/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (3 pgs/tape) 8/19/10 proc. w/cd
03/14/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/14/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/14/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION
03/14/2011RECEIVED - Appellee's Opposition to Motion to Supplement the Record
03/24/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
04/11/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
05/05/2011ORDERED that appellee's motion for leave is granted and the Clerk shall file the opposition. F/O that appellant's motion to supplement the record is denied. (ETW)
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/20/2011FiledSubmitted To Washington,Blackburne-Rigsby,Newman
11/17/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant)
11/30/2011FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to dismiss appeal.
11/30/2011FiledDismissed
12/23/2011FiledMandate