judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARLE VS. PACIFIC BEACH CLUB

Case Information: 47941
Short Caption:CARLE VS. PACIFIC BEACH CLUBCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0401088Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/01/2006 / Eisenberg, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/29/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Marc Picker, Esq., Ltd.--check no. 3191.
08/29/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17891
09/01/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert Eisenberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/14/2006Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 06-18955
09/15/2006Notice/Outgoing Letter. Robert Eisenberg. (Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal)
09/28/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 06-19908
09/28/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.