judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MOORE (ROBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47934
Short Caption:MOORE (ROBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40801
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C182562Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 06-17868
08/28/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: February 13, 2006 and July 28, 2006. Court Reporter: Peggy Isom and Lee Bahr. Filed in district court on: August 24, 2006. 06-17869
10/10/2006Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: October 16, 2006. 06-20673
10/10/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/28/06. Court Reporter: Lee M. Bahr. 06-20708
10/17/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (unopposed) 06-21313
10/25/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed 10/17/06. Transcripts due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement due: 20 days after transcripts are filed. 06-21965
11/06/2006Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter Margaret Isom regarding the order filed 10/25/06. 06-22607
11/15/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant: 20 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. Counsel for appellant shall include the transcript from February 13, 2006, in the appendix. 06-23479
12/06/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-24934
12/08/2006MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 13 pages. 06-25158
12/14/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on December 8, 2006. 06-25615
12/14/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 06-25159
12/14/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 06-25160
01/09/2007MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 14 pages. 07-00596
01/09/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 07-00598
01/09/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 07-00599
02/08/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-03156
03/06/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-04867
03/06/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/15/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 8, 2007. 07-04867