judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GETZ (JACK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 46029
Short Caption:GETZ (JACK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36107 , 43515 , 44166 , 52793
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C149459Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/18/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/29/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-19396
10/24/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. 05-21061
11/18/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 7. 05-22767
11/18/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/07/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Attorney General to Obtain and Transmit Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal Log. Certified copy of the notice of appeal log due: 30 days. If the notice of appeal log does not indicate that appellant delivered this notice of appeal to a prison official, the attorney general shall so inform this court. 05-23973
01/06/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (First Request). 06-00406
02/03/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Response from attorney general due: February 7, 2006. 06-02488
02/07/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request). 06-02783
02/27/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The attorney general shall file the response on or before March 8, 2006. No further enlargements will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. 06-04504
03/08/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Court Order. 06-05150
03/24/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn3-[We have received all proper person documents submitted in this matter, and we conclude that no relief is warranted.] SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-06282
04/18/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-07135
04/18/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 21, 2006. 06-07135