judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-7746
B-7746
07/11/1978
Application for Writ of Error
PATSY RUTH LOGAN, ET AL.
VARA BARGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/04/1978Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/02/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/31/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
07/11/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/04/1978Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/02/1978Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/31/1978Response to Petition
07/26/1978Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
07/21/1978Letter Filed
07/11/1978Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/11/1978Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Vara BargeRespondent
Patsy Ruth Logan, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information