judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FISHMAN VS. DIST CT. (PETRONE)

Case Information: 46018
Short Caption:FISHMAN VS. DIST CT. (PETRONE)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A460222Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/28/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/28/2005Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Petition for Emergency Writ of Mandamus and Motion for Immediate Stay of All Proceedings pending Determination of Writ. (Filed via fax.) 05-19312
09/29/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (via fax). 05-19324
09/29/2005Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Petition for Emergency Writ of Mandamus and Motion for Immediate Stay of All Proceedings pending Determination of Writ. (ORIGINAL--filed via fax on 9/28/05.) 05-19312
09/30/2005Petition/WritFiled Supplement to Petition for Writ. Supplement to Petition for Mandamus. (Filed via fax). 05-19433
09/30/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn3[In light of this order, we deny as moot petitioners' request to stay the trial.] NNP06-NB/MD/RP 05-19453
10/03/2005Petition/WritFiled Supplement to Petition for Writ. (filed by fax on 9/30/05). 05-19433
10/05/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Pico Escobar Rosenberger, Ltd., check no. 33037.
10/25/2005RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 05-19697
10/25/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.