judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MILLEN VS. DIST. CT. (MILLEN)

Case Information: 46001
Short Caption:MILLEN VS. DIST. CT. (MILLEN)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 49997 , 50421
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D290620Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/15/2006 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:06/15/2006How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/26/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Robert W. Lueck, Ltd.--check no. 1236.
09/26/2005Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 05-19098
09/27/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Directing Answer and Granting Temporary Stay. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. We temporarily stay the trial in District Court Case No. 02-D290620-D, pending our receipt and consideration of any opposition. 05-19179
10/19/2005Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 05-20737
10/25/2005MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. 05-21089
11/21/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. fn1[We grant petitioner's motion and direct the clerk to file the petitioner's reply, provisionally submitted on October 25, 2005.] We direct respondent, Judge Anthony Del Vecchio, to file an answer, within 30 days. fn5[The temporary stay of the trial in District Court Case No. 02-D290620D remains in effect pending our receipt and consideration of Judge Del Vecchio's answer.] 05-22915
11/21/2005Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Reply Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 05-21090
12/01/2005MotionFiled Motion. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Documents. 05-23556
12/27/2005MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave of Court to Allow Private Representation of Respondent Judge, and for Extension of Time in which to File Answer to Petition for a Writ of Mandamus. 05-25143
01/09/2006MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Leave of Court to Allow Private Representation of Respondent Judge and for Extension of Time. 06-00585
01/13/2006MotionFiled Response to Motion. Supplement to Opposition to Motion for Leave of Court to Allow Private Representation of Respondent Judge and for Extension of Time. 06-00973
01/25/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for an Extension of Time and Respondent's Request to Retain Private Counsel. Answer from Judge Del Vecchio due: 5 days. No further extensions shall be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. We also grant respondent's request for leave to retain Mr. Shapiro, who is licensed to practice law in Nevada. fn3[We grant petitioner's motion to submit a supplemental document, namely a letter from presiding Family Court Judge, Steven E. Jones.] 06-01839
02/03/2006Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer of Respondent Judge to Petition for Writ. 06-02540
04/21/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on June 15, 2006, at 9:30 a.m. (En Banc)
05/10/2006MotionFiled Motion. Lynn R. Shoen. 06-09829
05/16/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. to Withdraw (Lynn Shoen). This denial is without prejudice to Ms. Shoen's right to renew her motion upon completion of oral argument. 06-10281
05/30/2006MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Permission to Substitute in as Counsel for Real Party in Interest, Millen. 06-11283
05/30/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Dale K. Kleven as counsel for real party in interest. 06-11284
05/30/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
05/31/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for Substitution of Attorneys. Oral argument for this original proceeding is scheduled for June 15, 2006, at 9:30 a.m. in Carson City. The clerk shall substitute Mr. Kleven for Ms. Shoen as counsel of record for real party in interest. Mr. Kleven shall be permitted to participate in oral argument for this matter. 06-11430
06/15/2006OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker.
06/15/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. EN BANC
12/21/2006Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus. fn1[The Honorable Nancy A. Becker, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Hardesty, J. We concur: Rose, C.J., Maupin, Gibbons, Douglas and Parraguirre, JJ. 122 Nev. Adv. Opn. 105. EN BANC 06-26117
12/21/2006WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Robert W. Lueck for service upon Judge N. Anthony Del Vecchio. 06-26132
12/28/2006WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Del Vecchio on December 26, 2006. 06-26132
01/16/2007RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 07-00907
01/16/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.