judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WYLIE (ROBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 46009
Short Caption:WYLIE (ROBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 32847
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C114556Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Becker for Justice MaupinPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/29/2005How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/27/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 05-19148
10/24/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. 05-21056
11/29/2005Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 4. 05-23346
11/29/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/08/2005OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Sat in district court proceedings.
12/22/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response from the State due: 30 days. 05-24902
01/25/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 06-01854
02/23/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. We conclude that oral argument and briefing are unwarranted in this matter. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn19[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter and conclude that appellant is only entitled to the relief described herein. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter.] SNP06-NB/MG/JH 06-04017
03/21/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-04409
03/21/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/30/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 23, 2006. 06-04409