judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM D. MERCER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1066
Short Caption:WILLIAM D. MERCER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Lead:10-CO-1066Consolidated: 10-CO-1067
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL4965-01Filed Date:08/24/2010

Opening Event Date:08/24/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/06/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/22/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/10/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam D. Mercer YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Adam B. Schwartz YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/07/2010ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 10-CO-1066 and 10-CO-1067 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record indexes and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
07/20/2011FiledRecord Index (10-CO-1066)
07/20/2011FiledRecord Copies (10-CO-1066)
07/20/2011FiledRecord Index (10-CO-1067)
07/20/2011FiledRecord Copies (10-CO-1067)
07/20/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/22/2011FiledBriefing Order
08/01/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/01/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/06/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
09/06/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/17/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/29/2011FiledMotion for Leave to File Pro Se SUPPLEMENTAL Brief and Request for Oral Argument. (Served by: DCCA on 12/29/11) (Appellant)
12/29/2011FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Letter in Lieu of Formal Motion for Request of Oral Argument). (Appellant)
01/10/2012FiledOrder Denying pro se aplt's motion for oral argument.
01/24/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's pro se motion to supplement the brief.
01/24/2012FiledSupplemental Brief (Served by: DCCA on 12/29/11). (Appellant)
02/22/2012FiledSubmitted To Judges Thompson, Beckwith, Ferren
05/16/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Thompson, Associate Judge, and Ferren, Senior Judge.)
06/07/2012WithdrawnMandate****************RECALLED 6/21/12
06/08/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing (Appellant)**************CONSTRUED AS MOTION TO RECALL MANDATEGranted
06/21/2012FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RECALL the MANDATE and the CLERK SHALL FILE the LODGED PETITION FOR REHEARING/EN BANC and the PETITION FOR REHEARING IS DENIED and the PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC BE CIRCULATED to the FULL COURT
06/21/2012FiledPETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANCDenied
09/02/2014FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
09/10/2014FiledMandate