judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SKEETER AIMONE v. GENERAL CHEMICAL (SODA ASH) PARTNERS

Case Heading (S-07-0194)
Case Number:S-07-0194Case Docketed On:08/20/2007
Linked To: S-07-0193
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:SKEETER AIMONE v. GENERAL CHEMICAL (SODA ASH) PARTNERS
Full Title:SKEETER AIMONE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. GENERAL CHEMICAL (SODA ASH) PARTNERS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSkeeter AimoneSharon M. Rose
AppelleeGeneral Chemical (Soda Ash) PartnersScott Edward Ortiz
Stuart R. Day

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/20/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/20/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/02/2007Event - Phone Call - Received call from Mr. Ortiz indicating that the parties have reached a settlement and they will be filing a stipulated motion for voluntary dismissal.EventPhone CallFinal
10/04/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief - stipulated motionMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/08/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of cross appellant (faxed copy)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/08/2007Order - Grant - extension of time (stipulated)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/11/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief (Cross Appellant's - original)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/05/2007Event - Phone Call - received call from Scott Ortiz' office indicating that both cases have settled and they will try to get dismissal papers before brief due. Suggested that if the papers aren't ready, to fax a motion for extension of time pending receipt of motion to dismiss.EventPhone CallFinal
11/07/2007Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from Mr. Ortiz indicating that the parties have settled and dismissal documents will be forwarded.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
11/20/2007Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
11/20/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
11/20/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal