judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VITAL VS. VITAL

Case Information: 38176
Short Caption:VITAL VS. VITALCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D242842Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/25/2001 / Tavano, JenniferSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/30/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/16/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert O. Kurth, Jr.--check no. 1899.
07/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12085
07/25/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jennifer Elliott-Tavano. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to file a complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14938
10/17/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 27, 2001. 01-17544
12/10/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 20, 2001. 01-20673
12/24/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 10, 2002. 01-21659
01/30/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-01997
02/05/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. To date, appellant has failed to comply with the order filed September 5, 2001. Appellant shall file the docketing statement within 7 days of the date of this order or show cause why sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal, should not be imposed. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). Because this is a child custody matter, appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days after service of the opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have 10 days after service of the answering brie to file and serve the reply brief. NRAP 31(a)(2). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 02-02388
02/15/2002Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 02-03060
02/19/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/17/01, 2/2/01, 2/12/01, 2/26/01, 2/27/01, 4/6/01, 4/20/01, 11/26/01. To Court Reporter: Dept. J. 02-03143
02/22/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Receipt of Copy for transcripts. 02-03417
03/15/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-04739
03/19/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. of Transcript Video Services filed March 12, 2002. The motion further identified four requested dates that cannot be transcribed because the proceedings conducted on those dates were not recorded (01/07/01; 02/02/01; 02/26/01; 02/27/01). Transcript Video Services shall have until April 14, 2002, to prepare and file the transcripts for proceedings conducted on February 12, 2001; April 6, 2001; April 20, 2001; and November 26, 2001. 02-04942
03/22/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. On February 5, 2002, this court entered an order reinstating briefing. Because it appeared that this appeal involved issues concerning child custody, we directed the parties to brief this appeal pursuant to NRAP 31(a)(2) and directed appellant to file the opening brief by May 6, 2002. On February 15, 2002, appellant filed the docketing statement. A review of that statement reveals that appellant is only raising issues concerning spousal support and alimony. Because it appears that this appeal does not involve issues concerning child custody, we vacate that portion of our February 5, 2002 order setting forth an expedited briefing schedule. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by June 5, 2002. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-05120
03/29/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 02/12/01; 04/06/01; and 04/20/01. Court Reporter: Debbie Lohmuller. 02-05650
05/17/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record, to Adjudicate Rights of Attorney and Enforce Attorney's Lien. 02-08747
05/22/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 11/26/01. Court Reporter: Shelly A. Ajoub. 02-09016
06/07/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 06/05/02. 02-09983
06/07/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-09984
06/17/2002Other Other. Received Table of Contents to Appendix filed on 06/07/02. Attached to inside cover of Appendix.
07/05/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on 7/3/02. 02-11474
07/05/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 02-11475
07/11/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed May 17, 2002. We grant Ms. O'Brien's motion to withdraw. Respondent shall have 60 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel to represent her on appeal and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. Within the same time period, if respondent will not be retaining new counsel to represent her on appeal, she shall so notify this court, in writing. We caution respondent that if she fails to retain new counsel she will not be permitted to file additional documents in this appeal. 02-11834
08/19/2002Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
10/30/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. To date respondent has failed to retain new counsel to represent her on appeal. We conclude that respondent will be proceeding without counsel. To date, appellant has failed to file a reply brief. We deem the briefing of this appeal completed. Because respondent is not represented by counsel on appeal, this appeal shall be submitted for a decision on the briefs, without oral argument. 02-18664
10/30/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/15/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. April A. O'Brien as counsel for respondent. 02-19748
03/17/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-04390
04/11/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-04612
04/11/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/28/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 14, 2003. 03-04612