judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MRS. FLORENCE A. MCCALL, ADMINISTRATRIX, ET AL. v. GROGAN-COCHRAN LUMBER COMPANY

Case: A-277
A-277
07/21/1944
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. FLORENCE A. MCCALL, ADMINISTRATRIX, ET AL.
GROGAN-COCHRAN LUMBER COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/24/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/30/1945Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
03/02/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/25/1945Response to Brief filedPetitioner
01/16/1945Brief on the MeritsRespondent
01/03/1945Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
12/30/1944Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
12/22/1944Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/20/1944Errata FiledPetitioner
08/01/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
07/21/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/10/1946Order from Lower Court filed
04/09/1946Letter Filed
04/24/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/30/1945Brief in Support of Petition
03/08/1945Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
03/02/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/25/1945Response to Brief filed
01/18/1945Letter Filed
01/16/1945Brief on the Merits
01/15/1945Motion to Correct filed
01/10/1945Letter Filed
01/03/1945Response to Motion filed
01/03/1945Supplemental Brief filed
01/03/1945Motion to Strike filed
01/02/1945Letter Filed
12/30/1944Brief on the Merits
12/22/1944Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/20/1944Errata Filed
12/18/1944Letter Filed
11/23/1944Miscellaneous letter
11/13/1944Motion to re-set submission date filed.Filing granted
10/25/1944Document received (See Remarks)
10/25/1944Document received (See Remarks)
10/25/1944Document received (See Remarks)
10/25/1944Document received (See Remarks)
10/25/1944Document received (See Remarks)
10/25/1944Document received (See Remarks)
10/05/1944Letter Filed
08/01/1944Response to Petition
07/21/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/21/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
R. O. KenleyAmicus Curiae
Grogan-Cochran Lumber CompanyRespondent
Mrs. Florence A. McCall, Administratrix, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information