judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8529
A-8529
07/13/1961
Application for Writ of Error
PANSY RUTH WILLIAMS LLOYD AND HUSBAND, WILLIAM RICHARD LLOYD, FELIX EVANS, ET AL.
FRANK R GRAVES, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ADMINISTRATOR WITH THE WILL ANNEXED OF THE ESTATE OF ALICE JOHNSON ROBITAILLE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/14/1961Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
11/02/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/29/1961Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/28/1961Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/24/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
07/13/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/13/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/20/1961Response to Motion filed
11/14/1961Brief in Support of Petition
11/02/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/29/1961Reply to Response
07/28/1961Response to Petition
07/24/1961Response to Petition
07/13/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/13/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/13/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Felix Evans, et al.Petitioner
Frank R Graves, individually and as Administrator with the Will Annexed of the Estate of Alice Johnson RobitailleRespondent
Pansy Ruth Williams Lloyd and husband, William Richard LloydPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information