judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-278
A-278
07/21/1944
Application for Writ of Error
HAMLIN L. HILL
W. N. FOSTER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/16/1945Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/03/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/18/1944Response to Brief filedRespondent
12/13/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
08/11/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
07/21/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/23/1945Letter Filed
04/16/1945Reply to Response
04/13/1945Response to Motion filed
04/03/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/22/1945Motion to Withdraw Filed
12/18/1944Response to Brief filed
12/13/1944Brief in Support of Petition
11/03/1944Letter Filed
10/04/1944Document received (See Remarks)
08/11/1944Response to Petition
07/21/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/21/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. N. Foster, et al.Respondent
Hamlin L. HillPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information