judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8524
A-8524
07/12/1961
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
R. E. NEVILLE, ET AL.
TEXAS BITULITHIC COMPANY AND JAMES A. WILLIAMS, CITY OF ARLINGTON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/14/1961Motion for RehearingRelator
10/17/1961Brief on the MeritsRespondent
09/18/1961Brief on the MeritsRespondent
07/19/1961Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
07/19/1961Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/20/1961Response to Motion filed
12/16/1961Response to Motion filed
12/14/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/29/1961Opinion issued
10/17/1961Brief on the Merits
09/28/1961Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
09/18/1961Brief on the Merits
07/19/1961Brief in Support of Petition
07/19/1961Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
07/12/1961Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of Arlington, et al.Respondent
R. E. Neville, et al.Relator
Texas Bitulithic Company and James A. WilliamsRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information