judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-8552
A-8552
07/24/1961
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
BETTY RHODES AND BARRY RHODES
EDGAR SHERRILL, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/20/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/08/1961Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
11/03/1961Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
11/01/1961Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/31/1961Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
07/24/1961Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner
07/24/1961Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/11/1962sheriff's return
01/10/1962Commitment order issued in original proceeding
12/20/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/06/1961Opinion issued
11/08/1961Supplemental Brief filed
11/03/1961Supplemental Brief filed
11/01/1961Brief on the Merits
10/31/1961Brief on the Merits
08/01/1961Letter Filed
07/26/1961Bond
07/24/1961Order from Lower Court filed
07/24/1961Exhibits in case/cause filed
07/24/1961Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Edgar Sherrill, Jr.Respondent
Betty Rhodes and Barry RhodesPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information