Case: WR-87,975-03
WR-87,975-03
01/11/2018
11.07 HC
MORROW, GARY CHRISTOPHER
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/30/2019 | ACTION TAKEN | HC denied W/O written order on TC Fndgs-with Hear |
| ||||
12/20/2018 | RR RECEIVED |
| |||||
12/18/2018 | OBJECTION/FINDINGS |
| |||||
12/18/2018 | SUPP RECD |
| |||||
12/17/2018 | SUPP/CLERK RECORD |
| |||||
11/20/2018 | EXTENSION/SUPP DIS | Granted |
| ||||
11/06/2018 | EXTENSION/SUPP | | |||||
09/06/2018 | EXTENSION/SUPP DIS | Granted |
| ||||
09/05/2018 | EXTENSION/SUPP | | |||||
06/14/2018 | EXTENSION/SUPP DIS | Granted |
| ||||
06/13/2018 | EXTENSION/SUPP | | |||||
03/21/2018 | ORDER ISSUED | HC remanded TC - evidentiary hearing or affidavits |
| ||||
02/20/2018 | MISC DOCUMENT RECD |
| |||||
02/12/2018 | SUPP/CLERK RECORD |
| |||||
02/05/2018 | OBJECTION/FINDINGS |
| |||||
01/11/2018 | WRIT RECEIVED |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/30/2019 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
MORROW, GARY CHRISTOPHER | Applicant | Brett E. Ordiway Bruce Anton |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
336th District Court
Fannin
CR-13-24716-A