Case: 05-20-01005-CV
05-20-01005-CV
11/18/2020
Tax
Continental Heritage Insurance Company, Agent Pat Kinnard, d/b/a Pat Kinnard Bail Bonds
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/06/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
04/05/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
04/04/2021 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
03/06/2021 | Record due | | |||||
03/05/2021 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
02/05/2021 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
11/19/2020 | Docketing statement filed | ||||||
11/18/2020 | Additional copies of documents received after initial filing | | |||||
11/18/2020 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
11/18/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
11/10/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
11/09/2020 | Findings of fact and conclusions of law filed | | |||||
11/06/2020 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/04/2021 | Status | Appellant brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Continental Heritage Insurance Company, et al. | Appellant | Niles S. Illich |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Appellee | David Villafuerte Todd Keith Sellars John Creuzot |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Gracie Lewis
F18-18863-J
Kimberly Xavier