judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BERINGER (RANDALL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38147
Short Caption:BERINGER (RANDALL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40274
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C175263Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/09/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/09/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-11543
07/16/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/15/01; 5/22/01; 5/24/01. Court Reporters: Lisa Makowski and Mary Beth Cook. Filed in district court on: 7/12/01. 01-11953
07/27/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 29, 2001 and June 26, 2001. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. 01-12743
08/06/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/15/01; 5/22/01; and 5/24/01. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. 01-13219
08/21/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-14166
09/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed August 21, 2001. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 01-15015
09/06/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-15074
09/06/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-15075
09/18/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-15784
10/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP02Y-CY/DA/ML 01-17204
11/07/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-17361
11/07/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/15/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 9, 2001. 01-17361