judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEITH ROGERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1037
Short Caption:KEITH ROGERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL9067-91Filed Date:08/13/2010

Opening Event Date:08/13/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/23/2010
Argued/Submitted:04/13/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKeith Rogers YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Suzanne Clement Libby YN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/13/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/09/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 13, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (dfe)
09/21/2010RECORD INDEX
09/21/2010RECORD COPIES
09/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/23/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
09/27/2010CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED from Appellant: Keith Rogers Reg. # 04176-000 U.S.P. McCreary P.O. Box 3000 Pine Knot, KY 42635-3000
10/19/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
10/19/2010APPENDIX to Appellanmt's Brief.
11/23/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
11/23/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/08/2010APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
01/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
03/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
03/15/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT
03/22/2011ORDER DENYING APLT MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT and this matter shall be submitted for decision on April 13, 2011, without oral argumetn by either party, on the record and briefs alone. (JAC)
04/13/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/13/2011SUBMITTED to Judges Ruiz, Kramer, Belson
06/30/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Ruiz, Associate Judge, and Newman and Belson, Senior Judges.)
07/13/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing (Appellant)
09/30/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se petition for rehearing
10/07/2011FiledMandate