judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-7438
A-7438
07/16/1959
Application for Writ of Error
HENRY W. STRASBURGER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF MRS, D. A. COLE, DECEASED
MARJORIE MULLINS COMPTON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/30/1960Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/25/1960Response to Brief filedRespondent
05/10/1960Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
04/28/1960Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/25/1959Response to PetitionRespondent
07/16/1959Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/18/1960Motion for leave to file briefDenied
05/30/1960Reply to Response
05/25/1960Response to Brief filed
05/10/1960Brief in Support of Petition
05/02/1960Response to Motion filed
04/28/1960Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/25/1959Response to Petition
07/16/1959Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/16/1959Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Henry W. Strasburger, individually and as Independent Executor of the Estate of Mrs, D. A. Cole, deceasedPetitioner
Marjorie Mullins Compton, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information