judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRIMM (SELWYN) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 34827
Short Caption:GRIMM (SELWYN) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR97P0331Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/14/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-08681
09/15/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 4, 1999. Court Reporter: Nicole Alexander. 99-08730
10/05/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. June 28, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Eric V. Nelson. 99-09561
10/08/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Request by Appellant to File Fast Track Statement in Excess of Ten Pages. 99-09740
10/08/1999Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 99-09741
10/08/1999AppendixReceived Appendix. Appellant's Appendix. 99-09742
10/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On October 8, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion to file a fast track statement in excess of 10 pages. The clerk shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on October 8, 1999. 99-10421
10/25/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-09741
10/25/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-09742
10/27/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-10506
01/05/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. For the reasons stated in the attached order of the district court, we conclude that the district court properly denied appellant's petition. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-00149
02/01/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-01586
02/01/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/11/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 7, 2000. 00-01586