judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEROY P. DADE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1036
Short Caption:LEROY P. DADE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-11326-07Filed Date:08/13/2010

Opening Event Date:08/13/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/25/2010
Argued/Submitted:03/09/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLeroy P. DadeYPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/13/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/01/2010RECEIVED appellant's brief
09/01/2010RECEIVED appendix
09/09/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 13, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (dfe)
09/21/2010RECORD INDEX
09/21/2010RECORD COPIES
09/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/23/2010ORDERED: That the lodged appellant's brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
09/23/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
10/25/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
10/25/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
11/09/2010FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
11/19/2010APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
02/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
03/09/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/09/2011SUBMITTED to Judges Ruiz, Glickman, Thompson
05/12/2011REVERSED AND REMANDED (MOJ) (Ruiz, Glickman, and Thompson, Associate Judge.)
06/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED