Case: 20-0630
20-0630
08/14/2020
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE AMY CLARK MEACHUM
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/14/2020 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Amy Clark Meachum. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/26/2020 | Case Stored | e-stored | | |||||
08/21/2020 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Filing dismissed as moot | Chief Justice Hecht not participating |
| ||||
08/21/2020 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Filing granted | Motion to Dismiss Mandamus as Moot granted | | ||||
08/21/2020 | Motion to file document(s) sealed by the Court disposed. | Filing granted | Motion to Seal Unredacted Copy of Mandamus Record granted | | ||||
08/18/2020 | Sealed document filed in case | SEALED - Unredacted Mandamus Record filed on behalf of Amy Clark Meachum. | | |||||
08/18/2020 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Call to counsel for relator to have the electronic version of the pending sealed document sent to the Court. | | |||||
08/18/2020 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Call made to counsel for relator regarding receiving the sealed record. | | |||||
08/18/2020 | Motion to dismiss | Motion to Dismiss filed on behalf of Amy Clark Meachum. | ||||||
08/17/2020 | Call received | Call received from counsel for Relator regarding a forthcoming Motion to Dismiss. | | |||||
08/15/2020 | Motion to file document(s) sealed by the Court filed | Motion to File Unredacted Mandamus Record Under Seal filed on behalf of Amy Clark Meachum. | ||||||
08/14/2020 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to petition for writ of mandamus due no later than 4:30 p.m., Tuesday, August 18, 2020. |
| |||||
08/14/2020 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Call made to counsel for Relator regarding filing an unredacted version of the Record and Mandamus. | | |||||
08/14/2020 | Case Record Filed | Mandamus Record filed on behalf of Amy Clark Meachum. | ||||||
08/14/2020 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Amy Clark Meachum. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
08/26/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Green Party of Texas | Real Party in Interest | Wesson Gage |
Palmer, Laura | Real Party in Interest | Ms. Laura Palmer |
Meachum, Amy Clark | Relator | Mr. Kevin Vickers Ross Peavey Mr. Charles (Chad) E. Baruch Ms. Brandy Wingate Voss |
Waterbury, Charles E. | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Charles E. Waterbury |
Molison, Alfred | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Alfred Molison |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information